Name
|
Appointed
|
Date Ceased
|
Declaration of Interest in 2023/24
|
Directors
|
Natasha Hutcheson
Chair
|
23/03/2016
|
|
Synergy Trust – Chair
Employed by University of Anglia
|
Deborah Boldero
|
14/03/2016
|
|
Reepham High School & College trust appointed governor
Synergy MAT – Director
Eden Federation - Governor
|
Robin Hanley
Vice Chair
|
20/06/2022
|
|
Employed by Norfolk Museums Service
|
Tracey Hughes
|
14/03/2016
|
|
Alderman John Norman charitable foundation - Trustee
Assist Trust Normans Foundation – Trustee
Parochial Church Council of St Mary’s Church Sparham
|
Gill Pegg
|
01/09/2021
|
|
C T Baker – Minority Shareholder
Kelling Construction – Spouse’s Company
C T Baker – Charlotte Allman (Daughter) is a shareholder
C T Baker – Eve Gilmour (Daughter) is a shareholder
|
Constance Tyce
|
01/09/2021
|
|
Antingham & Southrepps Primary School – Chair of Governors
Stalham High School - Vice Chair of Governors
Ladybird Preschool & Nursery Sheringham – Trustee
|
Louise Lee
|
01/09/2023
|
|
Hart Multi-Academy Trust – Trustee
|
Susi Waters
|
16/01/2024
|
|
Julian Teaching Hub – CPD and training provider
Norfolk Research School – CPD and training provider
|
Members
|
Bryan Hurst
|
|
|
None declared
|
Philip Dewin
|
|
|
None declared
|
Andrew Savage
|
|
|
None declared
|
Senior Staff
|
Richard Lord
|
|
|
None declared
|
Rob Watton
|
|
|
None declared
|
Nick Frankland
|
|
|
None declared
|
Academy Schools’ Headteachers
|
|
|
|
Miles Elcock
Antingham & Southrepps Primary School
|
|
|
None declared
|
Jen Goakes
Astley Primary School
|
|
|
None declared
|
Catherine Ogle
Bawdeswell Primary School
|
|
|
None declared
|
Jacqueline Lound
Corpusty Primary School & Foulsham Primary School
|
|
|
None declared
|
Wille de Neve
Cromer Primary School
|
|
|
Headteacher at Cromer Junior School
|
Adam Mason
Fakenham Infant &Junior School
|
|
|
Married to Lisa Mason who has worked for Synergy MAT as a supply teacher
and exam invigilator
|
Marc Goodliffe
Gresham Village School
|
|
|
None declared
|
Tony Chapman
Mattishall Primary School
|
|
|
None declared
|
Catherine Ogle
Reepham Primary School
|
|
|
None declared
|
Tim Gibbs
Reepham High School & College
|
|
|
None declared
|
Alistair Ogle
Stalham High School
Sheringham High School
|
|
|
Ofsted Inspector
Hilltops Family Relation
|
|
|
|
|